NJ S4109 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3502
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Strengthens provisions of child-protection window guard law.
Title
Strengthens provisions of child-protection window guard law.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4109 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A5748 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A5748 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee