NJ S413 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1182
Note: Carry Over of previous S2043
Note: Carry Over of previous A4503
Note: Carry Over of previous S2043
Note: Carry Over of previous A4503
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - Approved P.L.2021, c.376.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - Approved P.L.2021, c.376.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands requirement of health insurers and Medicaid program to cover prescriptions for contraceptives for up to 12 months.
Title
Expands requirement of health insurers and Medicaid program to cover prescriptions for contraceptives for up to 12 months.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4698 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4698 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-13 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.376. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (30-9) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (67-10-2) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted for A4698 (1R) |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Health Committee |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-5) |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S413 (Carry Over) 2022-01-13 - Approved P.L.2021, c.376.
S2043 (Carry Over) 2018-02-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A4698 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S413 (SCS/1R)
A4503 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2043 (Carry Over) 2018-02-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A4698 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S413 (SCS/1R)
A4503 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee