NJ S4158 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S702
Note: Carry Foward to future A1675
Note: Carry Over of previous A4955
Note: Carry Over of previous S4205
Note: Carry Foward to future A1675
Note: Carry Over of previous A4955
Note: Carry Over of previous S4205
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases accidental death benefit for surviving spouse or surviving children of certain PERS members and retirants; provides accidental death benefit to beneficiary of certain PERS and PFRS members and retirants; redefines child.
Title
Increases accidental death benefit for surviving spouse or surviving children of certain PERS members and retirants; provides accidental death benefit to beneficiary of certain PERS and PFRS members and retirants; redefines child.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4158 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S4158 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A1660 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4955 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S4205 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S4158 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A1660 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4955 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S4205 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S4158 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S4500/4158_I1.HTM |