NJ S417 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2308
Note: Carry Foward to future S199
Note: Carry Over of previous S331
Note: Carry Over of previous A2369
Note: Carry Foward to future S199
Note: Carry Over of previous S331
Note: Carry Over of previous A2369
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-21 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-21 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires environmental sustainability plan for State House Complex.
Title
Requires environmental sustainability plan for State House Complex.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-1) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Smith) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S417 (Carry Over) 2022-11-21 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S417 (Carry Over) 2022-11-21 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S331 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2369 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1922 (Same As) 2022-11-21 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S417 (Carry Over) 2022-11-21 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S331 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2369 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1922 (Same As) 2022-11-21 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee