NJ S418 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1418
Note: Carry Foward to future S200
Note: Carry Over of previous S336
Note: Carry Over of previous A3586
Note: Carry Over of previous S2246
Note: Carry Over of previous A5234
Note: Carry Foward to future S200
Note: Carry Over of previous S336
Note: Carry Over of previous A3586
Note: Carry Over of previous S2246
Note: Carry Over of previous A5234
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes standards for food date labeling; requires Commissioner of Health to establish public education program and promulgate guidelines related to food safety.
Title
Establishes standards for food date labeling; requires Commissioner of Health to establish public education program and promulgate guidelines related to food safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-12-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S418 (Carry Over) 2022-12-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S418 (Carry Over) 2022-12-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S336 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3586 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A4342 (Same As) 2022-06-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S2246 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A5234 (Carry Over) 2021-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S418 (Carry Over) 2022-12-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S336 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3586 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A4342 (Same As) 2022-06-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S2246 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A5234 (Carry Over) 2021-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee