NJ S4212 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A463
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A6168
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A6168
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises law concerning insurance holding company systems.
Title
Revises law concerning insurance holding company systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Senate | Substituted by A6168 |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4212 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A6168
A6168 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.366.
A6168 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.366.