NJ S439 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2188
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A311
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A311
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires disclosure of breach of security of online account.
Title
Requires disclosure of breach of security of online account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-05 | Senate | Substituted by A311 |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2188 (Carry Over) 2014-06-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A311 (Same As) 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
A311 (Same As) 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)