NJ S482 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S360
Note: Carry Over of previous A1894
Note: Carry Over of previous A1894
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs State agencies to take certain actions to expedite permitting through use of general permits and permits-by-rule. *
Title
Directs State agencies to take certain actions to expedite permitting through use of general permits and permits-by-rule. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S360 (Carry Over) 2014-03-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1768 (Same As) 2016-06-20 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1894 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A1768 (Same As) 2016-06-20 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1894 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee