NJ S513 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4290
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-16 - Substituted by A2426 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-16 - Substituted by A2426 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes rebuttable presumption of pretrial detention for defendants who commit certain firearm offenses under Graves Act.
Title
Establishes rebuttable presumption of pretrial detention for defendants who commit certain firearm offenses under Graves Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Jon Bramnick [R] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-13 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Senate | Substituted by A2426 (2R) |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4290 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A2426 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - Approved P.L.2022, c.43.
A2426 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - Approved P.L.2022, c.43.