NJ S515 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2427
Note: Carry Over of previous A3769
Note: Carry Over of previous A3769
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A1176 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A1176 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to license certain qualifying hospitals to provide full service adult diagnostic cardiac catheterization, primary angioplasty, and elective angioplasty services.
Title
Requires DOH to license certain qualifying hospitals to provide full service adult diagnostic cardiac catheterization, primary angioplasty, and elective angioplasty services.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Michael Doherty [R] |
Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-07 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-17 | Senate | Substituted by A1176 (ACS) |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2427 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1176 (Same As) 2021-02-22 - Approved P.L.2021, c.18.
A3769 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1176 (Same As) 2021-02-22 - Approved P.L.2021, c.18.
A3769 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading