NJ S552 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S878
Note: Carry Over of previous A5785
Note: Carry Over of previous A5785
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits board of education to accept donations for purpose of providing property tax relief.
Title
Permits board of education to accept donations for purpose of providing property tax relief.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S878 (Carry Over) 2022-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A5785 (Carry Over) 2023-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3813 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A5785 (Carry Over) 2023-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3813 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S552 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S1000/552_I1.HTM |