NJ S562 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - Substituted by A914 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - Substituted by A914 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Chief Technology Officer in the Office of Information Technology to study and report potential benefits of expanding the use of electronic transactions, including the use of electronic signature and electronic record by the State.
Title
Directs Chief Technology Officer in the Office of Information Technology to study and report potential benefits of expanding the use of electronic transactions, including the use of electronic signature and electronic record by the State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Substituted by A914 (1R) | |
2010-03-15 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A914 (Same As) 2010-09-10 - Approved P.L.2010, c.76.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S562 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S1000/562_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S1000/562_R1.HTM |