NJ S564 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1253
Note: Carry Over of previous A5818
Note: Carry Over of previous A5818
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases statute of limitations for prosecution of theft of firearm.
Title
Increases statute of limitations for prosecution of theft of firearm.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1253 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5818 (Carry Over) 2023-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A3815 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A5818 (Carry Over) 2023-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A3815 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S564 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S1000/564_I1.HTM |