NJ S581 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Rutgers Discovery Informatics Institute, Office of Information Technology, NJ Edge.Net Inc., and New Jersey Big Data Alliance to develop advanced cyberinfrastructure strategic plan; appropriates $150,000.*
Title
Directs Rutgers Discovery Informatics Institute, Office of Information Technology, NJ Edge.Net Inc., and New Jersey Big Data Alliance to develop advanced cyberinfrastructure strategic plan; appropriates $150,000.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-09 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2219 (Same As) 2014-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A4684 (Same As) 2015-11-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4684 (Same As) 2015-11-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading