NJ S584 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-18 - Substituted by A911 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-18 - Substituted by A911 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes public providers of utility services to bill customers electronically upon customers' request.
Title
Authorizes public providers of utility services to bill customers electronically upon customers' request.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-18 | Substituted by A911 (1R) | |
2010-10-14 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-19 | Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A911 (Same As) 2010-11-30 - Approved P.L.2010, c.91.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S584 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S1000/584_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S1000/584_R1a.HTM |