NJ S625 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1498
Note: Carry Over of previous A2138
Note: Carry Over of previous A2138
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers NJ Board of Tree Experts from DEP to Dept. of Agriculture.
Title
Transfers NJ Board of Tree Experts from DEP to Dept. of Agriculture.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1498 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A3700 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
A2138 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A3700 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
A2138 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S625 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1000/625_I1.HTM |