NJ S638 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1055
Note: Carry Foward to future A3865
Note: Carry Over of previous S1267
Note: Carry Foward to future A3865
Note: Carry Over of previous S1267
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires full-day kindergarten in all school districts and establishes uniform age requirement for enrollment in kindergarten.
Title
Requires full-day kindergarten in all school districts and establishes uniform age requirement for enrollment in kindergarten.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S638 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S638 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1267 (Carry Over) 2014-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A3854 (Same As) 2016-06-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S638 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1267 (Carry Over) 2014-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A3854 (Same As) 2016-06-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/S638 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/S1000/638_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S638 |