NJ S650 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2062
Note: Carry Over of previous A3352
Note: Carry Over of previous A3352
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public water systems to provide certain notice of boil water notices and violations of drinking water quality standards.
Title
Requires public water systems to provide certain notice of boil water notices and violations of drinking water quality standards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2062 (Carry Over) 2018-02-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A2563 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A3352 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A2563 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A3352 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S650 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1000/650_I1.HTM |