NJ S650 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3819
Note: Carry Foward to future S3265
Note: Carry Over of previous S430
Note: Carry Over of previous A3347
Note: Carry Over of previous S82
Note: Carry Over of previous A442
Note: Carry Foward to future S3265
Note: Carry Over of previous S430
Note: Carry Over of previous A3347
Note: Carry Over of previous S82
Note: Carry Over of previous A442
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Human Trafficking and Child Exploitation Prevention Act"; requires Internet-connected devices to have blocking capability in certain circumstances.
Title
"Human Trafficking and Child Exploitation Prevention Act"; requires Internet-connected devices to have blocking capability in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S650 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S650 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S430 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3347 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A2952 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S82 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A442 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S650 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S430 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3347 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A2952 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S82 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A442 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S650 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1000/650_I1.HTM |