NJ S658 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits imposition of sewerage service connection fee by regional sewerage authorities and public utilities upon certain municipalities and boards of education.
Title
Prohibits imposition of sewerage service connection fee by regional sewerage authorities and public utilities upon certain municipalities and boards of education.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-3) |
2012-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |