NJ S676 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 5 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-05 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (59-15-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 5 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-05 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (59-15-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases workers' compensation for loss of hand or foot.
Title
Increases workers' compensation for loss of hand or foot.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Egan [D] | Rep. Elease Evans [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] |
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Rep. Grace Spencer [D] | Rep. John Wisniewski [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-05 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (59-15-4) | |
2011-12-05 | Substituted for A3166 | |
2011-11-28 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-25 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Passed by the Senate (24-12) | |
2010-02-18 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3166 (Same As) 2011-12-05 - Substituted by S676
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S676 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S1000/676_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S676 |