NJ S676 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2514
Note: Carry Over of previous A4506
Note: Carry Over of previous A4506
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides State recognition of Sandhill Indian Tribe for certain limited purposes.
Title
Provides State recognition of Sandhill Indian Tribe for certain limited purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Singer [R] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2514 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4506 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3617 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4506 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3617 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S676 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S1000/676_I1.HTM |