NJ S694 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S615
Note: Carry Foward to future A2382
Note: Carry Over of previous S1040
Note: Carry Foward to future A2382
Note: Carry Over of previous S1040
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires carriers to classify medically necessary procedures as covered benefits and remit certain payments to hospitals for services rendered.
Title
Requires carriers to classify medically necessary procedures as covered benefits and remit certain payments to hospitals for services rendered.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S694 (Carry Over) 2017-06-19 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S694 (Carry Over) 2017-06-19 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S1040 (Carry Over) 2014-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2990 (Same As) 2016-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S694 (Carry Over) 2017-06-19 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S1040 (Carry Over) 2014-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2990 (Same As) 2016-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/S694 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/S1000/694_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S694 |