NJ S724 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3001
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.44.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.44.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Integrated Roadside Vegetation Management Program."
Title
Establishes "Integrated Roadside Vegetation Management Program."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3604 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-08 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3604 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-08 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.44. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-4) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Substituted for A3604 (1R) |
2016-12-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-09-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2016-09-15 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (28-2) |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3001 (Carry Over) 2015-06-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A3604 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Substituted by S724 (2R)
A3604 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Substituted by S724 (2R)