NJ S736 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-28 - Approved P.L.2011, c.13.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-28 - Approved P.L.2011, c.13.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes new motorcycle safety provisions.
Title
Establishes new motorcycle safety provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-12-20 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-28 | Approved P.L.2011, c.13. | |
2010-12-20 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-4) | |
2010-12-13 | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | |
2010-12-13 | Passed by the Assembly (67-7-0) | |
2010-12-13 | Substituted for A576 (1R) | |
2010-11-15 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-09-13 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee | |
2010-08-23 | Passed by the Senate (31-3) | |
2010-05-27 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2010-03-04 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A576 (Same As) 2010-12-13 - Substituted by S736 (3R)