NJ S750 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1585
Note: Carry Foward to future S1455
Note: Carry Over of previous S2428
Note: Carry Over of previous A1602
Note: Carry Over of previous S397
Note: Carry Foward to future S1455
Note: Carry Over of previous S2428
Note: Carry Over of previous A1602
Note: Carry Over of previous S397
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides veterans with up to 60 credits tuition-free at county college serving county of residence.
Title
Provides veterans with up to 60 credits tuition-free at county college serving county of residence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S750 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S750 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2428 (Carry Over) 2020-05-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A1602 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A1806 (Same As) 2023-05-11 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S397 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A681
S750 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2428 (Carry Over) 2020-05-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A1602 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A1806 (Same As) 2023-05-11 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S397 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A681
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S750 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1000/750_I1.HTM |