NJ S754 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3086
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Combined with S724 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Combined with S724 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands authority of pharmacists, pharmacy interns, and pharmacy externs to administer certain vaccines.
Title
Expands authority of pharmacists, pharmacy interns, and pharmacy externs to administer certain vaccines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Senate | Combined with S724 (SCS) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3086 (Carry Over) 2017-03-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A342 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S724/754 (SCS/1R)
A342 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S724/754 (SCS/1R)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S754 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S1000/754_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S754 |