NJ S757 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S645
Note: Carry Over of previous S3120
Note: Carry Over of previous S3120
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public school student with concussion to be evaluated by physician or other licensed health care provider before return to school and return to physical activity at school.*
Title
Requires public school student with concussion to be evaluated by physician or other licensed health care provider before return to school and return to physical activity at school.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S757 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3120 (Carry Over) 2015-08-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A2481 (Same As) 2016-10-05 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S3120 (Carry Over) 2015-08-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A2481 (Same As) 2016-10-05 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading