NJ S761 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S576
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain deer control activities; prohibits deer feeding; and establishes check-off donation on hunting license applications to support venison donation program.
Title
Permits certain deer control activities; prohibits deer feeding; and establishes check-off donation on hunting license applications to support venison donation program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-08 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S576 (Carry Over) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4160 (Same As) 2016-10-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4160 (Same As) 2016-10-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/S761 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/S1000/761_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S761 |