NJ S775 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-25 - Substituted by A2380 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-25 - Substituted by A2380 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Alex DeCroce's Law, enhances crime victims' rights under the "Crime Victim's Bill of Rights." *
Title
Alex DeCroce's Law, enhances crime victims' rights under the "Crime Victim's Bill of Rights." *
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Senate | Substituted by A2380 (1R) |
2012-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2380 (Same As) 2012-08-07 - Approved P.L.2012, c.27.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S775 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S1000/775_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S1000/775_R1.HTM |