NJ S825 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Approved P.L.2010, c.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Approved P.L.2010, c.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes registry of offenders of individuals with developmental disabilities in DHS.
Title
Establishes registry of offenders of individuals with developmental disabilities in DHS.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Approved P.L.2010, c.5. | |
2010-02-25 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) | |
2010-02-25 | Substituted for A2038 | |
2010-02-25 | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-22 | Passed by the Senate (39-0) | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
A2038 (Same As) 2010-02-25 - Substituted by S825