NJ S833 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A150
Note: Carry Foward to future S1669
Note: Carry Over of previous A174
Note: Carry Over of previous S261
Note: Carry Over of previous S1782
Note: Carry Over of previous A5710
Note: Carry Foward to future S1669
Note: Carry Over of previous A174
Note: Carry Over of previous S261
Note: Carry Over of previous S1782
Note: Carry Over of previous A5710
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates requirement for State residency for public officers and employees with limited historic exceptions.
Title
Eliminates requirement for State residency for public officers and employees with limited historic exceptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S833 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S833 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A148 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A174 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S261 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S1782 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5710 (Carry Over) 2021-05-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
S833 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A148 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A174 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S261 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S1782 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5710 (Carry Over) 2021-05-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S833 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1000/833_I1.HTM |