NJ S846 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S760
Note: Carry Over of previous S3487
Note: Carry Over of previous A5477
Note: Carry Over of previous S3487
Note: Carry Over of previous A5477
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires provision of certain information on License Verification System concerning health care professionals.
Title
Requires provision of certain information on License Verification System concerning health care professionals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Senate Substitute (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Senate Substitute (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Senate Substitution (28-0) (Pou) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S846 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S3487 (Carry Over) 2019-02-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1027 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A5477 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S3487 (Carry Over) 2019-02-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1027 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A5477 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S846 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1000/846_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S846 |