NJ S871 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3432
Note: Carry Over of previous A4969
Note: Carry Over of previous A4969
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes eligibility for enrollment in PERS and subsequent retirement benefits for certain county fire instructors under certain conditions.
Title
Establishes eligibility for enrollment in PERS and subsequent retirement benefits for certain county fire instructors under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2024-06-28 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3432 (Carry Over) 2023-01-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4969 (Carry Over) 2022-12-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2286 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4969 (Carry Over) 2022-12-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2286 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee