NJ S875 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S58
Note: Carry Over of previous A2329
Note: Carry Over of previous A2329
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-02 - Approved P.L.2022, c.84.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-02 - Approved P.L.2022, c.84.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Division of Medical Assistance and Health Services in DHS to accept permanent change of station order for purposes of satisfying residency requirement for provision of home and community based services under certain circumstances.
Title
Requires Division of Medical Assistance and Health Services in DHS to accept permanent change of station order for purposes of satisfying residency requirement for provision of home and community based services under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Singer [R] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Edward Durr [R] |
Sen. Holly Schepisi [R] | Sen. Jean Stanfield [R] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2256 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2256 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-02 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2022, c.84. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A2256 |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Recommitted to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S58 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2329 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A2256 (Same As) 2022-06-16 - Substituted by S875
A2329 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A2256 (Same As) 2022-06-16 - Substituted by S875