NJ S894 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3130
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.266.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.266.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits sale of paint or coating removal products that contain methylene chloride unless purchaser meets certain safety standards for use.
Title
Prohibits sale of paint or coating removal products that contain methylene chloride unless purchaser meets certain safety standards for use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3874 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3874 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.266. |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A3874 (1R) |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3130 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3874 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S894 (1R)
A3874 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S894 (1R)