NJ S900 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S958
Note: Carry Foward to future A932
Note: Carry Over of previous A1004
Note: Carry Foward to future A932
Note: Carry Over of previous A1004
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Continues tax exempt status of certain real property owned by disabled veterans during reconstruction of homes destroyed by flood, storm, or other act of God.
Title
Continues tax exempt status of certain real property owned by disabled veterans during reconstruction of homes destroyed by flood, storm, or other act of God.
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Connors [R] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] |
Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S900 (Carry Over) 2018-03-26 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S900 (Carry Over) 2018-03-26 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A714 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A1004 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S900 (Carry Over) 2018-03-26 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A714 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A1004 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S900 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S1000/900_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S900 |