NJ S927 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-20 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-20 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State Auditor review of certain Department of Corrections privatization contracts.
Title
Requires State Auditor review of certain Department of Corrections privatization contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1880 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1880 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-20 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2012-06-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-30-0) |
2012-06-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A1880 |
2012-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (24-16) |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2012-06-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1880 (Same As) 2012-06-25 - Substituted by S927