NJ S927 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2557
Note: Carry Over of previous S4158
Note: Carry Over of previous A6025
Note: Carry Over of previous S4158
Note: Carry Over of previous A6025
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns parking spaces restricted for persons with disabilities located near youth athletic fields.
Title
Concerns parking spaces restricted for persons with disabilities located near youth athletic fields.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S927 (Carry Over) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S4158 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2803 (Same As) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A6025 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S4158 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2803 (Same As) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A6025 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S927 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1000/927_I1.HTM |