NJ S933 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A772
Note: Carry Over of previous S3055
Note: Carry Over of previous A4621
Note: Carry Over of previous S1966
Note: Carry Over of previous A2242
Note: Carry Over of previous S3055
Note: Carry Over of previous A4621
Note: Carry Over of previous S1966
Note: Carry Over of previous A2242
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires at least one member of BPU to reside in either Atlantic, Cape May, Monmouth, or Ocean County.
Title
Requires at least one member of BPU to reside in either Atlantic, Cape May, Monmouth, or Ocean County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S933 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A1627 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S3055 (Carry Over) 2020-10-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A4621 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S1966 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2242 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A1627 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S3055 (Carry Over) 2020-10-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A4621 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S1966 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2242 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S933 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1000/933_I1.HTM |