NJ S939 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2834
Note: Carry Foward to future S1505
Note: Carry Over of previous A823
Note: Carry Over of previous S2524
Note: Carry Over of previous A779
Note: Carry Foward to future S1505
Note: Carry Over of previous A823
Note: Carry Over of previous S2524
Note: Carry Over of previous A779
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurance carriers to provide coverage for persons 18 or younger with diagnosed complex medical needs.
Title
Requires health insurance carriers to provide coverage for persons 18 or younger with diagnosed complex medical needs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S939 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S939 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A663 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A823 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S2524 (Carry Over) 2020-06-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A779 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
S939 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A663 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A823 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S2524 (Carry Over) 2020-06-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A779 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S939 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1000/939_I1.HTM |