NJ S941 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies informed consent provisions of "Access to Medical Research Act" for persons with developmental disabilities.
Title
Clarifies informed consent provisions of "Access to Medical Research Act" for persons with developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee | |
2010-06-21 | Passed by the Senate (38-0) | |
2010-05-27 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3940 (Same As) 2011-05-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee