NJ S944 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1509
Note: Carry Over of previous S408
Note: Carry Over of previous S2560
Note: Carry Over of previous A3701
Note: Carry Over of previous S408
Note: Carry Over of previous S2560
Note: Carry Over of previous A3701
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Police Officer, Firefighter, Public School Teacher, Corrections Officer, and Sanitation Worker Home-buyer Assistance Act"; appropriates $5 million.
Title
Establishes "Police Officer, Firefighter, Public School Teacher, Corrections Officer, and Sanitation Worker Home-buyer Assistance Act"; appropriates $5 million.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S944 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S408 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2560 (Carry Over) 2020-06-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3701 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S408 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2560 (Carry Over) 2020-06-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3701 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S944 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1000/944_I1.HTM |