NJ S946 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - Approved P.L.2014, c.31.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - Approved P.L.2014, c.31.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Implements constitutional amendment providing for pretrial detention of certain criminal defendants; establishes non-monetary bail alternatives for release; authorizes Judiciary to revise fees for certain legal programs and services.*
Title
Implements constitutional amendment providing for pretrial detention of certain criminal defendants; establishes non-monetary bail alternatives for release; authorizes Judiciary to revise fees for certain legal programs and services.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1910 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Assembly - Assembly Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1910 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1910 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Assembly - Assembly Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1910 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2014, c.31. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (53-7-9) |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | Emergency Resolution (63-2-3) (Burzichelli) |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | Substituted for A1910 (3R) |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (29-5) |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (31-0) (Norcross) |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Senate Amendment (30-0) (Norcross) |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment (26-0) (Norcross) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1910 (Same As) 2014-08-04 - Substituted by S946 (3R)