NJ S965 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1626
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Historic Property Reinvestment Act"; provides credits against certain taxes for certain costs of rehabilitating historic properties.
Title
"Historic Property Reinvestment Act"; provides credits against certain taxes for certain costs of rehabilitating historic properties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1626 (Carry Over) 2014-06-02 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/S965 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/S1000/965_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S965 |