NJ S973 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S696
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Early Childhood Innovation Act"; establishes early childhood innovation loan pilot program and study commission within EDA.
Title
"Early Childhood Innovation Act"; establishes early childhood innovation loan pilot program and study commission within EDA.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S973 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3531 (Same As) 2016-04-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3531 (Same As) 2016-04-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee