NJ S973 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4829
Note: Carry Over of previous S3068
Note: Carry Over of previous S3068
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-16 - Approved P.L.2020, c.58.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-16 - Approved P.L.2020, c.58.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Commissioner of Labor and Workforce Development to establish apprenticeship mentoring program for women, minorities, and persons with disabilities.
Title
Requires Commissioner of Labor and Workforce Development to establish apprenticeship mentoring program for women, minorities, and persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1408 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2020, c.58. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A1408 |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1408 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Substituted by S973
A4829 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3068 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4829 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3068 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading