NJ S975 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3046
Note: Carry Over of previous A3133
Note: Carry Over of previous A3133
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Approved P.L.2021, c.83.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Approved P.L.2021, c.83.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes trunk fighting as animal cruelty offense and crime of the third degree.
Title
Establishes trunk fighting as animal cruelty offense and crime of the third degree.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3231 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3231 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.83. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0) |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A3231 |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3046 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A3231 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S975
A3133 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A3231 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S975
A3133 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee