NJ S976 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3065
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - Approved P.L.2016, c.86.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - Approved P.L.2016, c.86.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Public Health Council to promulgate rules and regulations for use of quality control programs in bio-analytical and clinical laboratories.
Title
Requires Public Health Council to promulgate rules and regulations for use of quality control programs in bio-analytical and clinical laboratories.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Gordon [D] | Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Rep. Grace Spencer [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2332 Aaa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2332 Aaa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-09 | Senate | Approved P.L.2016, c.86. |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2016-10-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2016-09-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2016-09-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A2332 (3R) |
2016-09-15 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Benson) |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3065 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A4652 (1R)
A2332 (Same As) 2016-09-29 - Substituted by S976 (2R)
A2332 (Same As) 2016-09-29 - Substituted by S976 (2R)