NJ S988 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2238
Note: Carry Over of previous A1060
Note: Carry Over of previous S1457
Note: Carry Over of previous A1060
Note: Carry Over of previous S1457
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Phases out the transfer inheritance tax over two years.
Title
Phases out the transfer inheritance tax over two years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S988 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1792 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A1060 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
S1457 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1792 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A1060 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
S1457 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S988 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1000/988_I1.HTM |